EP0924924 - Technique for automatically activating and deactivating the availability of image borders as a function of time [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinton, Timothy, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [2002/16] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited (W92) Patents Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1999/25] | Lewandowsky, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kodak Aktiengesellschaft, Patentabteilung 70323 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 98204194.9 | 09.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | US19970995737 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: US 995737 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924924 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924924 | Date: | 30.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/387 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
H04N1/3871 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur automatischen Aktivierung oder Deaktivierung der Verfügbarkeit von Bildrändern als eine Zeitabhängige Funktion | [1999/25] | English: | Technique for automatically activating and deactivating the availability of image borders as a function of time | [1999/25] | French: | Technique pour l'activation ou la désactivation automatique de la disponibilité de bords d'images en fonction du temps | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 12.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0326515 (ALPORT HOLDING INC [PA]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0647057 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5 - column 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5343386 (BARBER PAMELA L [US]) [A] 1 * column 4 - column 9; figures 1-12 * |