EP0924507 - Interferometer for measurements of optical properties in bulk samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.11.2004 [2004/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Optical Technologies U.S.A. Corp. 9 East Lookerman Street Dover, DE 19901 / US | [2003/33] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states Optical Technologies U.S.A. Corp. 9 East Lookerman Street Dover, Delaware / US | ||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barberis, Angelo Via Orombella, 29 20040 Cambiago, Milano / IT | 02 /
Caselli, Stefano V.le Vittorio Veneto, 29 41053 Meranello, Modena / IT | 03 /
Pietralunga, Silvia Maria Via Marconi, 5 20060 Cassina de'Pecchi, Milano / IT | 04 /
Martinelli, Mario Via Agadir, 16/B 20097 San Donato Milanese, Milano / IT | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | Marchi, Massimo, Dr., et al Marchi & Partners, Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 98204339.0 | 18.12.1998 | [1999/25] | Priority number, date | EP19970122615 | 22.12.1997 Original published format: EP 97122615 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0924507 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0924507 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/00, G01N21/45 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
G01N21/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/20] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [2000/09] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Interferometer zu Messung optischer Eigenschaften in Proben | [1999/25] | English: | Interferometer for measurements of optical properties in bulk samples | [1999/25] | French: | Interferomètre pour mesurer des propriétés optiques d'un échantillon | [1999/25] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 24.12.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.03.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 18.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Request for further processing for: | 02.08.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.08.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.2000 | 28.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.2000 | 28.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.2000 | 28.01.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.2000 | 28.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   05.02.2000 | 28.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.01.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.11.2003 | [2004/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5268739 (MARTINELLI MARIO ET AL) [DA] 1,15,21 * page 2 *; | [DA] - KANG K I ET AL, "Nonlinear-index-of-refraction measurement in a resonant region by the use of a fiber Mach-Zehnder interferometer", APPLIED OPTICS, 20 MARCH 1996, OPT. SOC. AMERICA, USA, ISSN 0003-6935, vol. 35, no. 9, pages 1485 - 1488, XP002059396 [DA] 1,15,21 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.35.001485 | [DA] - SARGER L ET AL, "Time-resolved absolute interferometric measurement of third-order nonlinear-optical susceptibilities", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA B (OPTICAL PHYSICS), JUNE 1994, USA, ISSN 0740-3224, vol. 11, no. 6, pages 995 - 999, XP002059397 [DA] 1,15,21 * figure 1 * |