EP1013776 - A sensitive assay for the detection or quantitation of human cytomegalovirus nucleic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.02.2001 [2001/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit van Amsterdam Spui 21 1012 WX Amsterdam / NL | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Ottevangers, Sietse Ulbe, et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux, Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 98204421.6 | 22.12.1998 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013776 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70 | [2000/26] | CPC: |
C12Q1/705 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Empfindliches Testverfahren zum Nachweis oder zur Quantifizierung der Nukleinsäure des menschlichen Cytomegalovirus | [2000/26] | English: | A sensitive assay for the detection or quantitation of human cytomegalovirus nucleic acid | [2000/26] | French: | Méthode sensible d'essai pour la détection ou pour la quantification d'acide nucléique de cytomégalovirus humain | [2000/26] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/08] | 24.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2001/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9502067 (AKZO NOBEL NV ;BEUNINGEN MARINUS GERARDUS JOH (NL); KIEVITS TIM (N) [A] 1-24 * claims 1-16 *; | [A]WO9703345 (ROYAL FREE HOSP SCHOOL MED ;EMERY VINCENT CLIVE (GB); GRIFFITHS PA) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9410342 (ROGOSIN INST); | [A] - NASH K ET AL, "Internal controls as performance monitors and quantitative standards in detection by polymerase chain reaction of herpes simplex and cytomegalovirus in clinical samples", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR PROBES, (199510), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 347 - 56, XP002110293 [A] 1-11,14-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0890-8508(95)91668-7 | [A] - REVELLO M G ET AL, "HUMAN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS INFECTION: DIAGNOSIS BY ANTIGEN AND DNA DETECTION", REVIEWS IN MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (19941001), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 0954-139X, pages 265 - 276, XP000560452 [A] 1-24 * page 272, paragraph 6 - page 274 * | [A] - MEYER-KONIG U ET AL, "HUMAN CYTOMEGALOVIRUS IMMEDIATE EARLY AND LATE TRANSCRIPTS IN PERIPHERAL BLOOD LEUKOCYTES: DIAGNOSTIC VALUE IN RENAL TRANSPLANT RECIPIENTS", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (19950301), vol. 171, no. 3, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 705 - 709, XP000560445 [A] 1-24 * page 706 * | [A] - ZIPETO D ET AL, "Human cytomegalovirus (CMV) DNA in plasma reflects quantity of CMV DNA present in leucocytes", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199510), vol. 33, no. 10, pages 2607 - 11, XP002110312 [A] 1-24 | [T] - BOOM R ET AL, "Improved silica-guanidiumthiocynate DNA isolation procedure based on selective binding of bovine alpha-casein to silica particles", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199903), vol. 37, no. 3, pages 615 - 19, XP002110313 [T] 1-24 * the whole document * |