EP0889053 - BK-RiV preparations for teatment of proliferative cellular disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/01] | Uses of BK-RiV preparations, process for their production and proteins comprised therein | ||
[2005/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solisch, Peter, Dr.med.habil. Am Rundling 7 17498 Riemserort / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states Solisch, Peter, dr.med.habil. Am Rundling 7 17498 Riemserort / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solisch, Peter, Dr.med.habil. Am Rundling 7 17498 Riemserort / DE | 02 /
Kalies, Kai-Uwe, Dr. Saarbrücker Strasse 11 10405 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Bergmann, Steffi, Dr. Auerstrasse 9 10247 Berlin / DE | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Ziebig, Marlene Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 DE-10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Ziebig, Marlene Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/15] | Ziebig, Marlene, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte, Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig, Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2002/09] | Gulde, Klaus W., Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig Schützenstrasse 15-17 10117 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1999/01] | Kolberg, Peter, Dr. Genovevastrasse 6/8 12555 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 98250225.4 | 22.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | DE1997128323 | 27.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19728323 | [1999/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0889053 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0889053 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0889053 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0889053 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47, C07K1/14, A61K35/12, A61P17/06, A61P35/00, A61P29/00 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K14/4721 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | C07K14/47, C07K1/14, A61K35/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/50] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | BK-RiV-Präparate zur Behandlung von proliferativen Zellerkrankungen | [2006/06] | English: | BK-RiV preparations for teatment of proliferative cellular disorders | [2005/15] | French: | Préparations à base de BK-RiV pour le traitement de maladies prolifératives cellulaires | [2005/15] |
Former [1999/01] | Verwendungen von BK-RiV-Präparaten, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung sowie darin enthaltene Proteine | ||
Former [1999/01] | Uses of BK-RiV preparations, process for their production and proteins comprised therein | ||
Former [1999/01] | Utilisations des préparations à base de BK-RiV, procédé de leur production, et les protéines contenues dans celles-ci | Examination procedure | 05.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2002 | 30.06.2003 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.10.2005 | GB | 19.10.2005 | IT | 19.10.2005 | SE | 19.01.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/12] | GB | 19.10.2005 | |
IT | 19.10.2005 | ||
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | GB | 19.10.2005 | |
SE | 19.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | SE | 19.01.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0702955 (SOLISCH PETER DR MED HABIL [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3 * siehe Spalte 1, Zeile 50 - Spalte 2, Zeile 28; Spalte 5, Zeilen 8-40; Ansprüche 1,3 *; | [DX]DE9218127U (SOLISCH PETER DR MED HABIL [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3 * siehe Seite 10, Zeile 11- Seite 12; Ansprüche 1-2 *; | [DX]DE4238766 (SOLISCH PETER DR MED HABIL [DE], et al) [DX] 1-4 * siehe Spalte 1, Zeilen 30-66;Spalte 4, Zeilen 35-61; Anspruch 2; *; | [X]DD156667 (SOLISCH PETER, et al) [X] 1,3,5 *siehe Seite 2, Zeilen 42-53; Seite 5, Zeilen 135-139; Anspruch *; | [X] - SOLISCH, "Zur Dignität einer bisher unbekannten Zellreaktion: "RiV". Eine Hypothese", ZENTRALBLATT FÜR PATHOLOGIE, (1992), vol. 138, no. 2, pages 136 - 140, XP002083610 [X] 1,3,5 * siehe insbesondere Seite 137, rechte Spalte "Biologische Wirkung" * | [A] - COX J C ET AL, "Adjuvants--a classification and review of their modes of action", VACCINE, (199702), vol. 15, no. 3, page 248-256, XP004094403 [A] 1-11,13,14 * siehe insbesondere Tabellen 1 und 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(96)00183-1 |