EP0919244 - Combinations for the treatment of tumours [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Borstel Zentrum für Medizin und Biowissenschaften Parkallee 1 - 40 23845 Borstel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Borstel Zentrum für Medizin und Biowissenschaften Parkallee 1 - 40 23845 Borstel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Bosch, Jürgen, Dr. Engelsgrube 53 23552 Lübeck / DE | 02 /
Schlaak, Max, Prof. Dr. Elsa-Brandströmstrasse 9 24119 Kronshagen / DE | 03 /
Rüller, Stephan, Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 28 22941 Bargteheide / DE | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98250357.5 | 09.10.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | DE1997144676 | 10.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19744676 | [1999/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919244 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919244 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/445, A61K38/13, A61K31/55, A61K31/40, A61K31/45, A61K31/395, A61K31/52, A61K31/165, // (A61K31/445, 31:165, 31:52, 31:395, 31:40, 31:445),(A61K38/13, 31:445),(A61K31/55, 31:445) | [2000/12] | CPC: |
A61K31/40 (EP);
A61K31/395 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP);
A61K38/13 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/40, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/40, A61K31/395, A61K31/35 (EP);
A61K31/55, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/55, A61K31/40, A61K31/35 (EP); |
Former IPC [1999/22] | A61K45/06 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/49] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kombinationspräparate für die Therapie von Tumoren | [1999/22] | English: | Combinations for the treatment of tumours | [1999/22] | French: | Combinaisons pour le traitement des tumeurs | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/34] | 10.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.10.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 31.10.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9730174 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,16,17,32 * page 14, line 34 - page 16, line 33 * * page 126, line 1 - page 126, line 25 * * page 133, line 1 - page 140, line 30; claims 15-17 *; | [X] - K C BIBLE ET AL, "CYTOXIC SYNERGY BETWEEN FLAVOPIRIDOL (NSC 649890, l86-8275) AND VARIOUS ANTINEOPLASTIC AGENTS: THE IMPORTANCE OF SEQUENCE OF ADMINISTRATION", CANCER RES., (19970815), vol. 57, pages 3375 - 3380, XP002128085 [X] 1-4,16,17,32 * Seiten 3379-3380 "Discussion" *; page 133, line 1 - page 140, line 30; claims 15-17 * | [X] - M WEIL, "CONSTITUTIVE EXPRESSION OF THE MACHINERY FOR PROGRAMMED CELL DEATH", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (199606), vol. 133, no. 5, pages 1053 - 1059, XP002125981 [X] 1-4,12,13,16,17,32 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.133.5.1053 | [X] - K C BIBLE ET AL, "FLAVOPIRIDOL: a CYTOTOXIC FLAVONE THAT INDUCES CELL DEATH IN NONCYCLING A549 HUMAN LUNG CARCINOMA CELLS", CANCER RESEARCH, (19961101), vol. 56, pages 4856 - 4861, XP002125982 [X] 1-4,12,13,16,17,32 * abstract * | [A] - L MEIJER, "CHEMICAL INHIBITORS OF CYCLIN-DEPENDANT KINASES", TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, (199610), vol. 6, pages 393 - 397, XP002125983 [A] 1-4,16,17,32 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0962-8924(96)10034-9 | [T] - L-F FEE ET AL, "PACLITAXEL (TAXOL)-INDUCED GENE EXPRESSION AND CELL DEATH ARE BOTH MEDIATED BY THE ACTIVATION OF C-JUN NH2-TERMINAL KINASE (JNK/SAPK)", J. BIOL. CHEM., (19981023), vol. 43, pages 28253 - 28260, XP002128086 [T] 1-4,16,17,32 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.43.28253 |