EP0855548 - Evacuating pipelines and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE, IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hygienic Pigging Systems Limited 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park, University Boulevard Nottingham NG7 2RF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states Hygienic Pigging Systems Limited 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park, University Boulevard Nottingham NG7 2RS / GB | ||
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states Hygienic Pigging Systems Limited 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park, University Boulevard Nottingham NG7 2RS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Palmer, Thomas, c/o Hygienic Pigging Systems Ltd. 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park University Boulevard, Nottingham NG7 2RF / GB | [2006/42] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
Palmer, Thomas, c/o Hygienic Pigging Systems Ltd. 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park University Boulevard, Nottingham NG7 2RS / GB | ||
Former [1998/31] | 01 /
Palmer, Thomas, c/o Hygienic Pigging Systems Ltd. 5 Edison Village, Highfields Science Park University Boulevard, Nottingham GN7 2RS / GB | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300282.5 | 15.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | GB19970000936 | 17.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9700936 | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855548 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855548 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855548 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP0855548 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L55/40, B08B9/04 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
F16L55/1283 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | F16L55/40 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2000/52] |
Former [2000/51] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | ||
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Entleerung eines Rohres | [1998/31] | English: | Evacuating pipelines and apparatus therefor | [1998/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'évacuation de conduites | [1998/31] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/49] | 12.10.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, FI, GR, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.11.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.11.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 05.07.2006 | IT | 05.07.2006 | DK | 05.10.2006 | ES | 16.10.2006 | IE | 15.01.2007 | [2008/12] |
Former [2007/29] | BE | 05.07.2006 | |
DK | 05.10.2006 | ||
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | DK | 05.10.2006 | |
ES | 16.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | ES | 16.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE9111600U (CZEKANOWSKY) [X] 1-12,17,19,20,24-26,30 * page 4, line 19 - page 4, line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US3875606 (LANDERS DON B) [X] 1-5,11,13,17,19-22,24-26,30 * column 3, line 2 - column 3, line 16; figure 2 *; | [X]DE3032532 (SKIBOWSKI HUBERT) [X] 1,2,17,22-26,30 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 1; figure 3 *; | [A]DE19513104 (PFEIFFER CHEMIE ARMATUREN [DE]) [A] 1,18,22,23,27 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4422294 (SAMSON AG [DE]) [A] 1,12,14,15,22-26,29,30 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 14; figure 1 * |