EP0855584 - Method for making a pressure transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/31] | Pressure transducer apparatus and method for making | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75243 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC. 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75243 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beringhause, Steven 13 Stonyfield Road Norton, MA 02766 / US | 02 /
Lukasiewicz, Stanley J. 11 Courtney Place North Attleboro, MA 02760 / US | 03 /
Leedecke, Charles J. 278 Lowell Street New Bedford, MA 02745 / US | [1998/31] | Representative(s) | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/31] | Blanco White, Henry Nicholas, et al ABEL & IMRAY Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300568.7 | 27.01.1998 | [1998/31] | Priority number, date | US19970036742P | 27.01.1997 Original published format: US 36742 P | [1998/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0855584 | Date: | 29.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0855584 | Date: | 28.04.1999 | [1999/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0855584 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/12, G01L9/00 | [1999/18] | CPC: |
G01L9/0075 (EP,US);
G01L9/0073 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/31] | G01L9/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/02] |
Former [1998/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für eine Druckwandlervorrichtung | [2003/22] | English: | Method for making a pressure transducer | [2003/22] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un transducteur de pression | [2003/22] |
Former [1998/31] | Druckwandlervorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1998/31] | Pressure transducer apparatus and method for making | ||
Former [1998/31] | Dispositif transducteur de pression et méthode de fabrication | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 13.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2004/33] | NL | 05.11.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0755616 ; | [YD]US4716492 (CHARBONEAU THOMAS J [US], et al) [YD] 1-6,9 * column 6, line 49 - line 65; figures 4,5 *; | [YX]EP0473109 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 1-9,11,13 * abstract * * column 5, line 21 - line 27 * [X] 10; | [YX]US5400489 (HEGNER FRANK [DE], et al) [Y] 6,11,13 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 8; figure 2 *[X] 12 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950731), vol. 095, no. 006, & JP07055616 A 19950303 (PACIFIC IND CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * |