EP0856627 - Sliding door assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.11.2005 [2005/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE STANLEY WORKS 1000 Stanley Drive New Britain, CT 06053 / US | [1998/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobs, Kenneth The Thatch, Linersh Wood Road Bramley, Surrey, GU5 0EF / GB | 02 /
Menard, Joseph Auguste Canlea, Ringsbury Close Purton, Swindon, Wiltshire, SN5 9DE / GB | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Godwin, Edgar James Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | Godwin, Edgar James MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | ||
Former [1998/32] | White, Martin David MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300688.3 | 30.01.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | GB19970001852 | 30.01.1997 Original published format: GB 9701852 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856627 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856627 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | [2002/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856627 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/06 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
E05D15/0665 (EP);
E05Y2201/614 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, NL [2002/39] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schiebetür-Anordnung | [1998/32] | English: | Sliding door assembly | [1998/32] | French: | Système de porte coulissante | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 07.01.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 06.03.2005 | [2005/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2641569 (KRIEG & ZIVY) [Y] 1 * page 5, line 20 - page 11; figure - *; | [Y]FR2707328 (SOGAL FRANCE) [Y] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5349783 (JASPERSON) [A] 3 * column 5, line 29 - column 43; figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2601408 (GUERIN) |