EP0856583 - Protein rab3 GEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 4-1-8 Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332 / JP | For all designated states JCR PHARMACEUTICALS Co., LTD. 3-19, Kasuga-cho Ashiya-shi Hyogo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 4-1-8 Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332 / JP | ||
For all designated states JCR Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 3-19, Kasuga-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo / JP | |||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 4-1-8 Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP | ||
For all designated states JCR Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 3-19, Kasuga-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo / JP | |||
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Corporation 4-1-8 Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama-ken 332 / JP | ||
For all designated states Wada, Manabu 1-16 Momoyamadai, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takai, Yoshimi 2-5-73 Gakuen-Higashimachi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-21 / JP | 02 /
Nakanishi, Hiroyuki 2-5-110 Gakuen-Nishimachi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-21 / JP | 03 /
Wada, Manabu 1-16 Momoyamadai, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 655 / JP | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Matthews, Derek Peter Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300740.2 | 02.02.1998 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | JP19970019254 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: JP 1925497 | [1998/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0856583 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0856583 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856583 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
C07K14/4722 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rab3 GEP Protein | [1998/32] | English: | Protein rab3 GEP | [1998/32] | French: | Protéine d'échange GDP/GTP (GEP) rab3 | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 26.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 14.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 14.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHOW V T K AND LEE S S, "DENN, a novel human gene differentially expressed in normal and neoplastic cells", DNA SEQUENCE, (1996), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 263 - 273, XP002119552 [X] 2-4 * the whole document * | [X] - FUJIWARA T ET AL., "Human placenta cDNA 5'-end GEN-553C12", EMEST16, EMBL, (19961004), XP002119556 [X] 4 * abstract * | [A] - ARAKI K ET AL, "Purification and characterization of Rab GDI beta from rat brain.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1995 JUN 6) 211 (1) 296-305. JOURNAL CODE: 9Y8., XP002119553 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1995.1810 | [A] - REGAZZI R ET AL., "Expression, localization and functional role of small GTPases of the Rab3 family in insulin-secreting cells", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (199609), vol. 109, no. Pt.9, pages 2265 - 2273, XP002119554 [A] * the whole document * | [PX] - WADA M ET AL, "Isolation and characterization of a GDP/GTP exchange protein specific for the ---Rab3--- subfamily small G proteins.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1997 FEB 14) 272 (7) 3875-8. JOURNAL CODE: HIV., XP002119555 [PX] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.7.3875 |