EP0858838 - Phase separation media, e.g. papermachine clothing or filters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Change - representative | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Oakfield House, 93 Preston New Road Blackburn Lancashire BB2 6AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states SCAPA GROUP PLC Oakfield House, 93 Preston New Road Blackburn, Lancashire BB2 6AY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Sanjay 116 Westminster Summerville, SC 29485 / US | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | ||
Former [1998/34] | Middlemist, Ian Alastair, et al Wilson Gunn M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester, M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98300909.3 | 09.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | US19970797321 | 10.02.1997 Original published format: US 797321 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0858838 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B01J39/08, D21F1/00, C08G73/22, C08G75/32 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
D21F1/0027 (EP);
C08G73/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/18] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Phasetrennungsmedien, z.B. Papiermaschinegewebe oder Filter | [1998/34] | English: | Phase separation media, e.g. papermachine clothing or filters | [1998/34] | French: | Milieux de séparation de phases, par exemple toiles pour machines à papier ou filtres | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/02] | 19.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 06.05.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08299721 ; | JPH08299721 [ ]; | [A]JPS63182500 ; | [A]WO9116123 (THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] 1-11,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 97, no. 3, & JP08299721 A 19961119 (TOYOBO CO. LTD.) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,13 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 05, Database accession no. 97-046454, XP002065757 & JPH08299721 A 00000000 (TOYOBO K.K.) [ ] * abstract * | [X] - ANONYMUS, "Uses for PBO fiber", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE., HAVANT GB, (19931010), vol. 354, no. 39, pages 678 - 684, XP000412834 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - "Special paper-like sheet useful in capacitors and filter paper", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 36, Database accession no. 88-252949, XP002065758 & JPS63182500 A 19880727 (TORAY IND. K.K.) [A] 1-11,13 * abstract * |