EP0859124 - Method and apparatus for completing wells with lateral branches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas Texas 75381-9052 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. P.O. Box 819052 Dallas, Texas 75381-9052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longbottom, James R. P.O. Box 1115 Magnolia, Texas 77353 / US | 02 /
Van Petegam, Ronald Snehvitveien 58 4300 Sandnes / NO | 03 /
Turner, William H. Balgownie, Meikle Wartle Inverurie, Aberdeenshire AB515AA / GB | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Wain, Christopher Paul, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301029.9 | 12.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | US19970799333 | 13.02.1997 Original published format: US 799333 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0859124 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0859124 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | [2002/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0859124 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | E21B29/06, E21B33/10, E21B23/00, E21B7/06 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
E21B7/061 (EP,US);
E21B23/12 (EP,US);
E21B29/06 (EP,US);
E21B41/0042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [2002/43] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Komplettieren von Mehrfach-Bohrungen | [1998/34] | English: | Method and apparatus for completing wells with lateral branches | [1998/34] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'équipement des puits ramifiés | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/22] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04077012.5 / EP1467059 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Request for further processing for: | 09.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 27.04.2005 | IT | 27.04.2005 | NL | 27.04.2005 | DK | 27.07.2005 | DE | 28.07.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/12] | IT | 27.04.2005 | |
NL | 27.04.2005 | ||
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | NL | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
DE | 28.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | NL | 27.04.2005 | |
DK | 27.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | DK | 27.07.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4807704 (HSU FRANK H [US], et al) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 23 - line 40 * * column 3, line 57 - line 61 *; | [A]US5353876 (CURINGTON ALFRED R [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 13, line 6 - line 16 *; | [A]US5454430 (KENNEDY BRIAN S [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 3 - line 18 ** column 11, line 22 - line 29 * | by applicant | US4807704 |