EP0936839 - System for providing sound distinctions and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thompson, Billie M. 1635 East Seldon Lane Phoenix, AZ 85020 / US | For all designated states Thompson, Kirk D. 1635 East Seldon Lane Phoenix, AZ 85020 / US | [1999/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/33] | Representative(s) | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/33] | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw, 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301057.0 | 13.02.1998 | [1999/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0936839 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0936839 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/033 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
H04R1/1041 (EP);
H04R5/04 (EP);
H04R1/1008 (EP);
H04R2460/13 (EP);
H04R5/033 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/34] |
Former [2000/17] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/33] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | System für Schallerkennung und Verfahren dafür | [1999/33] | English: | System for providing sound distinctions and method therefor | [1999/33] | French: | Système pour la distinction des sons et procédé pour ce système | [1999/33] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/34] | 06.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 03.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 13.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.04.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   27.04.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.01.2003 | BE | 02.01.2003 | CH | 02.01.2003 | FI | 02.01.2003 | FR | 02.01.2003 | GR | 02.01.2003 | IT | 02.01.2003 | LI | 02.01.2003 | NL | 02.01.2003 | DK | 02.04.2003 | GB | 02.04.2003 | SE | 02.04.2003 | DE | 03.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/12] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
BE | 02.01.2003 | ||
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
FR | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
GB | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DE | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
BE | 02.01.2003 | ||
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
GB | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DE | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
BE | 02.01.2003 | ||
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DE | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DE | 03.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
DK | 02.04.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
DE | 03.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 02.01.2003 | |
CH | 02.01.2003 | ||
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
GR | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
FI | 02.01.2003 | ||
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
NL | 02.01.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/40] | CH | 02.01.2003 | |
LI | 02.01.2003 | ||
SE | 02.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | SE | 02.04.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02182098 ; | [A]JPH07299051 ; | [X]DE2451977 (UNIV ST LOUIS) [X] 1,2,4,6-12 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 20 * * page 3, line 8 - page 6, line 29 *; | [YA]US3984636 (TURNER JACOB C, et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-12 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 34 * * column 2, line 67 - column 6, line 43 * [A] 3,5; | [Y]US5521982 (SCHIFTAN YAIR [CH]) [Y] 1,2,4,6-12 * column 1, lines 5-48 * * column 1, line 64 - column 3, line 40 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900928), vol. 14, no. 455, Database accession no. (E - 0985), & JP02182098 A 19900716 (HIROSHI OSADA) [Y] 1,2,4,6-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 96, no. 3, & JP07299051 A 19951114 (RION) [A] 1,6-12 * abstract * |