EP0859108 - Espagnolette bolting systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states European Lock Co. Ltd. Pilgrims House, Clease Way, Compton Down Winchester Hampshire SO21 2AL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states European Lock Co. Ltd. Pilgrims House, Clease Way, Compton Down Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2AL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Middleton, Colin Sidney Pilgrims House, Clease Way, Compton Down Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2AL / GB | [1998/34] | Representative(s) | Prentice, Raymond Roy Calvert's Buildings 52B Borough High Street London SE1 1XN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | Prentice, Raymond Roy Calvert's Buildings, 52B Borough High Street London SE1 1XN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301100.8 | 16.02.1998 | [1998/34] | Priority number, date | GB19970003256 | 17.02.1997 Original published format: GB 9703256 | [1998/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0859108 | Date: | 19.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E05C9/04 | [1998/34] | CPC: |
E05C9/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/18] |
Former [1998/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Treibstangenverschluss | [1998/34] | English: | Espagnolette bolting systems | [1998/34] | French: | Serrure à crémone | [1998/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/03] | 14.07.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.04.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 28.04.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 28.04.1999 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2264529 (CEGO LTD) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5; | [Y]FR2583452 (ETABLISSEMENTS JEAN MASSARD) [Y] 3-5 * page 2, line 15 - line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]FR717401 (GISIE FRERES S.A.R.L.) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]CH178162 (KIEFER) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE929710 (FELCO SCHLOSS- UND BESHLAGFABRIK G.M.B.H.) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2257745 (WOOD) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]DE9001279U (FERCO INTERNATIONAL USINE DE FERRURES DE BATIMENT) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2570744 (SA CROISEES ET PROFILS) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [X]CH403541 (J. SUTER & CIE.) [X] 1,2,6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1452272 (SERVANT) [A] 1,3-5 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0248142 (ISEO SERRATURE SPA) [A] 1,3-5 * the whole document * |