EP0895205 - Card reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagi, Ryouichi c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Hiramoto, Yoshio c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Asoh, Izumi c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | 04 /
Kato, Masashi c/o Fujitsu Limited, 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku, Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | [1999/05] | Representative(s) | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/05] | Hitching, Peter Matthew, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301103.2 | 16.02.1998 | [1999/05] | Priority number, date | JP19970206941 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20694197 | [1999/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0895205 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0895205 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0895205 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06K19/073, G06K7/00 | [1999/47] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K7/0008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/105 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3576 (EP,US);
G07F7/0886 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/05] | G07F7/10, G06K19/073 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/31] |
Former [1999/05] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kartenleser | [1999/05] | English: | Card reader | [1999/05] | French: | Lecteur de cartes | [1999/05] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 22.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9700500 (UESTRA HANNOVERSCHE VERKEHRSBE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * claims 1-4,11 * * figure 2 * [A] 3-6; | [A]WO9419777 (MIKROKIT OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-3,8-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 25 * * claims 1,2 *; | [E]EP0838789 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [E] 1,2,4-6,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * column 1, line 9 - line 28 * * column 6, line 46 - line 56 * * column 9, line 44 - line 47 * * claims 1,5,7,10,11 *; | [PXA]DE19629085 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-3,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 31 * * claims 1,10 * [A] 11 |