EP0860729 - Image display system, information processing apparatus, and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/29] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sudo, Toshiyuki Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301174.3 | 18.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | JP19970036328 | 20.02.1997 Original published format: JP 3632897 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860729 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860729 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | [1998/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860729 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/22, H04N13/00 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
H04N13/275 (EP,US);
G02B30/27 (US);
G02B30/30 (EP);
H04N13/31 (EP,US);
H04N13/315 (EP,US);
H04N13/327 (EP,US);
H04N13/361 (EP,US);
H04N13/398 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
H04N13/10 (EP,US);
H04N13/161 (EP,US);
H04N13/189 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/30] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildanzeigesystem, Informationsverarbeitungsgerät und Verfahren zur Steuerung desselben | [1998/35] | English: | Image display system, information processing apparatus, and method of controlling the same | [1998/35] | French: | Système d'affichage d'image, appareil de traitement d'information et méthode pour le commander | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 31.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.12.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 23.12.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Appeal following examination | 23.02.2004 | Appeal received No. T0622/04 | 26.04.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2005 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/26] | Request for further processing for: | 29.05.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.06.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.07.2006 | NL | 19.07.2006 | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/21] | NL | 19.07.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0656555 (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1,34 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 23; claim 1 * [A] 18,35; | [A]EP0721131 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1,18,34,35 * column 7, line 39 - column 8, line 7 * * column 10, line 28 - column 11, line 23 *; | [XA]DE19500699 (HENTSCHKE SIEGBERT PROF DR ING [DE]) [X] 1,34 * column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 65; claim 2 * [A] 18,35; | [A] - ISONO H ET AL, "AUTOSTEREOSCOPIC 3-D DISPLAY USING LCD-GENERATED PARALLAX BARRIER", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART II - ELECTRONICS, (19930701), vol. 76, no. 7, pages 77 - 83, XP000429012 [A] 1,2,18,34,35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ecjb.4420760709 | Examination | EP0540137 |