EP0937533 - Laser breakthrough detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.10.2003 [2003/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M J Technologies Limited 16 Whitwick Business Park Coalville Leicester LE67 4JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states M J Technologies Limited 16 Whitwick Business Park Coalville, Leicester LE6 4JP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duffin, Jason E c/o M J Technologies Ltd, Whitwick Business Park Coalville, Leicestershire, LE67 4JP / GB | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Serjeants LLP Dock 75 Exploration Drive Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | SERJEANTS 25, The Crescent King Street Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301202.2 | 19.02.1998 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937533 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/00, B23K26/02 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
B23K26/032 (EP);
B23K26/382 (EP);
B23K26/389 (EP);
B23K26/40 (EP);
B23K2103/04 (EP);
B23K2103/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/22] |
Former [2000/19] | AT, BE, CH, LI | ||
Former [2000/18] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laserdurchsteckdetektion | [1999/34] | English: | Laser breakthrough detection | [1999/34] | French: | Détection du passage au travers d'un laser | [1999/34] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/22] | 24.10.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/41] | 06.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 12.03.2000 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   13.03.2000 | 12.03.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   13.03.2000 | 12.03.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   13.03.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 12.03.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   13.03.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   19.03.2002 | 28.02.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5026964 (SOMERS RALPH M ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,6 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 23; figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP0344339 (A L L GMBH) [A] 4,5; | [AD]GB2113592 (PRECI SPARK LTD) [AD] * the whole document * |