EP0860676 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho, Isesaki-cho Isesaki-shi Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | For all designated states Sanden Corporation 20 Kotobuki-cho, Isesaki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kado, Hirotaka, c/o Sanden Corporation 20, Kotobuki-cho Isesaki-shi, Gunma 372-8502 / JP | [1998/35] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/35] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301231.1 | 19.02.1998 | [1998/35] | Priority number, date | JP19970053940 | 21.02.1997 Original published format: JP 5394097 | [1998/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0860676 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0860676 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0860676 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [1998/35] | CPC: |
F28F9/0243 (EP,US);
F28F9/001 (EP,US);
F28F9/002 (EP,US);
F28F9/0212 (EP,US);
F28F2220/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/16] |
Former [1998/35] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [1998/35] | English: | Heat exchanger | [1998/35] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [1998/35] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 14.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5535819 (MATSUURA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 11 - line 37; figures 14-18 * [A] 3,5; | [A]US5265672 (AOKI HISAO [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5348079 (TANAKA HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5178211 (BAUER DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 5 * | by applicant | JPS6446680U | JPH07120190 |