EP0861663 - Osteoclastgenic inhibitory agent comprising interleukin-18 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | ||
Former [1998/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA HAYASHIBARA SEIBUTSU KAGAKU KENKYUJO 2-3, 1-chome, Shimoishii Okayama-shi Okayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillespie, Matthew Todd, Department of Medicine The Uni. of Melbourne and St. Vincent's Inst. Med. Res 41 Victoria Parade Fitzroy 3065 / AU | 02 /
Horwood, Nicole Joy, Department of Medicine The Uni. of Melbourne and St. Vincent's Inst. Med. Res 41 Victoria Parade Fitzroy 3065 / AU | 03 /
Udagawa, Nobuyuki 16-7, 3-chome, Akehara Kashiwa-shi, Chiba / JP | 04 /
Kurimoto, Masashi 7-25, Gakunan-cho 2-chome Okayama-shi, Okayama / JP | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/36] | Daniels, Jeffrey Nicholas, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301352.5 | 24.02.1998 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | JP19970055468 | 25.02.1997 Original published format: JP 5546897 | [1998/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0861663 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0861663 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0861663 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P19/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/54 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/36] | A61K38/20, // C07K14/54 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/49] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ein Interleukin-18 enthaltender Agent, der Osteoclastzellen inhibiert | [1998/36] | English: | Osteoclastgenic inhibitory agent comprising interleukin-18 | [1998/36] | French: | Agent inhibiteur des ostéoclastes comprenant l'interleukin-18 | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/37] | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0712931 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-11 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 44 * * page 9, lines 29-53 * * page 11, line 50 - page 12, line 56 * [Y] 12; | [Y]EP0721780 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [Y] 12 * page 1, line 1 - line 21; example 2 *; | [A] - BEIER D R ET AL, "ABSENCE OF A NOVEL PUTATIVE TRANSPORTER CAUSES OSTEOPETROSIS IN THE OSTEOCLEROSIS (OC) MOUSE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HUMAN GENETICS,US,NEW YORK, NY, vol. 59, no. 4, ISSN 0002-9297, page A280, XP002038817 [A] 1-12 |