EP0880147 - Multiconductor electrical cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2001 [2001/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMCO INTERNATIONAL INC. 7030 Ardmore Street Houston Texas 77054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states CAMCO INTERNATIONAL INC. 7030 Ardmore Street Houston, Texas 77054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McHugh Marcus D. 4700 Carmal Place Lawrence, Kansas 66047 / US | 02 /
Oswald, Howard A. 1032 Andover Street Lawrence, Kansas 66049 / US | 03 /
Atkeisson, Julia 129 Michigan Lawrence, Kansas 66044 / US | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Carter, Gerald, et al Arthur R. Davies & Co. 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 1RQ / GB | [1998/48] | Application number, filing date | 98301355.8 | 25.02.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | US19970858408 | 19.05.1997 Original published format: US 858408 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0880147 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01B9/02, H01B7/28, H01B7/18 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
H01B7/046 (EP);
H01B3/441 (EP);
H01B7/2806 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/31] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrisches mehradriges Kabel | [1998/48] | English: | Multiconductor electrical cable | [1998/48] | French: | Câble électrique multiconducteur | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 30.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/09] | 05.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2113453 (ELECTRICITY COUNCIL) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 4 - line 15; figure 1 *; | [X]US4398058 (GERTH DIETER ET AL) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE2504555 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-19 * page 3, line 9 - line 24; figure 1 *; | [X]WO8201785 (JPS ELTEKNIK AS ;STUBKJAER JENS E (DK)) [X] 1-19 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3651244 (SILVER DAVID A ET AL) [X] 1-19 * column 2, line 55 - line 69 * * column 4, line 44 - line 63; figures 1,8 * |