EP0865079 - A method for removing redeposited veils from etched platinum surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - classification | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | 26.03.2004 | Change - classification | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Jeng H. 20835 Scofield Drive Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [1998/38] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301614.8 | 04.03.1998 | [1998/38] | Priority number, date | US19970816851 | 13.03.1997 Original published format: US 816851 | [1998/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865079 | Date: | 16.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865079 | Date: | 20.10.1999 | [1999/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
C23F4/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/32136 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1999/42] | H01L21/3213, H01L21/3205, H01J37/32, H01L21/02 | ||
Former IPC [1998/38] | H01L21/3213, H01L21/3205, H01J37/32 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/26] |
Former [1998/38] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beseitigung von auf geätzten Platinflächen abgelagerten Verunreinigungen | [1998/38] | English: | A method for removing redeposited veils from etched platinum surfaces | [1998/38] | French: | Méthode d'enlèvement d'impuretés redéposées sur un surface de platine préalablement gravée | [1998/38] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/18] | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/18] | 21.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5515984 (YOKOYAMA SEIICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 2, line 1 - line 52 * * column 3, line 12 - column 6, line 17 *; | [DA] - KEIL D ET AL, "The etching of platinum electrodes for PZT based ferroelectric devices", ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS, (199605), vol. 96-12, pages 515 - 521 521, XP002100986 [DA] 1-4,7,8,10,11 * page 516, paragraph 3 * |