EP0919154 - Hair dryer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2001 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yoon-ku 613-808 Bosung Aprtm. No. 1265 Kweonsun-dong Kweonsun-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Ok-ha 10-207 Samsung 3rd Aprtm. Maetan-4-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Tae-yoon 4-203 Wooram Apartm. 349-8 Whaseo-2-dong Jangan-gu, Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/22] | Geary, Stuart Lloyd, et al Venner, Shipley & Co., 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301736.9 | 10.03.1998 | [1999/22] | Priority number, date | KR19970064502 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: KR 9764502 | KR19970064511 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: KR 9764511 | KR19970064512 | 29.11.1997 Original published format: KR 9764512 | [1999/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0919154 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0919154 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | [2001/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/08, H05B3/14 | [1999/22] | CPC: |
A45D20/12 (EP);
H05B3/00 (EP);
H05B3/141 (EP);
H05B3/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haartrockner | [1999/22] | English: | Hair dryer | [1999/22] | French: | Sèche-cheveux | [1999/22] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/12] | 30.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYA]US4316077 (CARLSON RICHARD H) [X] 1-5,8-12 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-3,7,8 * [Y] 7,15 [A] 6,13,14; | [XY]US3927300 (WADA SHIGETAKA ET AL) [X] 1,6-8,13 * column 2, lines 16-20 * * column 8, lines 45-47; figures 1-4,6 * * column 8, lines 12-21 * [Y] 14; | [Y]US5039843 (MUELLER MANFRED K) [Y] 7,15 * abstract *; | [Y]US5023744 (HOFSAESS PETER) [Y] 7,15 * abstract *; | [Y]US4647757 (HAASTRUP HENRIK K) [Y] 14 * column 3, lines 40-42 * |