Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3886242B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2007 | B2 | JPH10277949 | 20.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0865876 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2004 | B1 | EP0865876 | 15.03.2000 | A3 | EP0865876 | 23.09.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE258098T | 15.02.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2231929 | 02.10.2007 | C | CA2231929 | 17.09.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69821153T | 08.07.2004 | T2 | DE69821153D1 | 26.02.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2212223T | 16.07.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA982097 | 16.09.1998 | B | Priority number | Date | ZA972281 | 17.03.1997 |