EP0865876 - Abrading method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELEMENT SIX (PTY) LTD Debid Road, Nuffield 1559 Springs / ZA | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states ELEMENT SIX (PTY) LTD Debid Road, Nuffield 1559 Springs / ZA | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states De Beers Industrial Diamonds (Proprietary) Limited Debid House, Corner Amethyst Street and Crownwood Road, Theta Johannesburg 2001 / ZA | ||
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMONDS (PTY) LTD Debid House, Corner Amethyst Street and Crownwood Road, Theta Johannesburg 2001 / ZA | ||
Former [1998/39] | For all designated states DE BEERS INDUSTRIAL DIAMOND DIVISION (PROPRIETARY) LIMITED Debid House, Corner Amethyst Street & Crownwood Road, Theta Johannesburg / ZA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tank, Klaus 9 Warbleton Avenue Essexwold, Johannesburg / ZA | 02 /
Fries, Robert The Cottage, 11 Lystanwold Road Essexwold, Johannesburg / ZA | 03 /
Eckert, Jurgen Dietrich 229 San Juan Avenue Berario, Johannesburg / ZA | [1998/39] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2003/17] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/39] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98301942.3 | 16.03.1998 | [1998/39] | Priority number, date | ZA19970002281 | 17.03.1997 Original published format: ZA 9702281 | [1998/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0865876 | Date: | 23.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0865876 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0865876 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/08, B24D17/00, B24B7/28, B27B33/02, B27G15/00 | [1998/39] | CPC: |
B24D99/00 (EP);
B24B19/24 (EP);
B24D3/08 (EP);
C22C26/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/47] |
Former [1998/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schleifverfahren | [1998/39] | English: | Abrading method | [1998/39] | French: | Procédé d'abrasion | [1998/39] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 30.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0198653 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]) [YD] 1-8 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 4, line 25 - line 27 ** page 7, line 3 - line 4; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]EP0583916 (DE BEERS IND DIAMOND [ZA]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 30 - line 37; claims 15-17 * |