EP0867375 - Container with hinged lid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McKechnie Components Limited Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states McKechnie Components Limited Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall, West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states McKechnie UK Limited Leighswood Road, Aldridge Walsall, West Midlands WS9 8DS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loftus, Stephen Clive, Paxton Div. of McKechnie UK Ltd., Newfield Cl. Green Lane Walsall, West Midlands, WS2 7PB / GB | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/40] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302013.2 | 18.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | GB19970006432 | 27.03.1997 Original published format: GB 9706432 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867375 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/16, E05D11/00, E05D7/10 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
E05D7/1066 (EP);
B65D43/165 (EP);
E05D11/0027 (EP);
B65D2251/10 (EP);
E05Y2999/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1999/29] |
Former [1999/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI | ||
Former [1998/40] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Behälter mit Scharnierdeckel | [1998/40] | English: | Container with hinged lid | [1998/40] | French: | Récipient avec couvercle articulé | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/21] | 01.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, GR, LI, LU, MC | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/17] | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.06.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.06.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0070611 (CURVER BV [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure 13 *; | [X]FR2555237 (THIRIET PHILIPPE [FR]) [X] 1-5 * page 3, line 21 - page 3, line 37 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 5 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3341855 (OTTO BERNS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 7, line 14 - page 10, line 2 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0356322 (ALLIBERT SA [FR]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 2, column 1, line 46 - page 2, column 2, line 11 * * page 3, column 3, line 43 - page 3, column 4, line 29 * * figure 2 * |