blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0869330

EP0869330 - Apparatus for testing tyre tread depth [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.02.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.03.2001 [2001/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Assembly Technology & Test Limited
15 St. Botolph Street
London EC3A 7NJ / GB
[1998/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Whitehead, Mark
27 Blenheim Close, Kingsmead
Northwich, Cheshire, CW9 8FB / GB
[1998/41]
Representative(s)Crouch, David John, et al
Bromhead Johnson LLP
57-59 High Street
Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/41]Crouch, David John, et al
Bromhead & Co. 19 Buckingham Street
London WC2N 6EF / GB
Application number, filing date98302090.019.03.1998
[1998/41]
Priority number, dateGB1997000665602.04.1997         Original published format: GB 9706656
[1998/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0869330
Date:07.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0869330
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G01B11/06, G01B11/22
[1999/31]
CPC:
G01B11/22 (EP,US); G01B2210/50 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1998/41]G01B11/06
Designated contracting states[2000/38]
Former [1998/41]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Überprüfungsapparat für die Tiefe einer Reifenlauffläche[1998/41]
English:Apparatus for testing tyre tread depth[1998/41]
French:Appareil pour examiner la profondeur de la bande de roulement d'un pneumatique[1998/41]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/13]
03.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
21.08.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
21.08.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
21.08.2000M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9707380  (MOT TECHNOLOGIES LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,15-17 * page 14 - page 15; figures 2,3,5-13 * [Y] 18,22;
 [Y]DE9111993U  (DREYER D. ET AL) [Y] 18 * figure 7 *;
 [Y]DE1809459  (FUCHS DR EKKEHARD, et al) [Y] 22 * page 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4316984  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,8,15,17,18,22,23 * column 2 - column 3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9637754  (BUERGER JOACHIM [IE]) [A] 1,15,18,23 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.