EP0871013 - Position encoder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company, A Delaware Corporation 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | ||
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbehenn, George 2609 SE Briarwood Drive Vancouver, WA 98683-9153 / US | [1998/42] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2002/30] | Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [1998/42] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302211.2 | 24.03.1998 | [1998/42] | Priority number, date | US19970840079 | 09.04.1997 Original published format: US 840079 | [1998/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0871013 | Date: | 14.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0871013 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0871013 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0871013 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/245, G01D5/36, H03M1/30 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B41J11/42 (EP,US);
G01D5/2457 (EP,US);
G01D5/366 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/42] | G01D5/245 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [2001/12] |
Former [1998/42] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Positionskodierer | [1998/42] | English: | Position encoder | [1998/42] | French: | Codeur de position | [1998/42] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/08] | 14.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE DR. JOHANNES HEIDENHAIN GmbH Postfach 1260 83292 Traunreut / DE | [2004/13] | 11.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 08.09.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.07.2005 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.01.2006 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 04.04.2006 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.07.2003 | LI | 02.07.2003 | [2007/17] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5130536 (SATO SEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * column 4, line 51 - column 7, line 58; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-6; | [XA]US4866268 (TANG DAH-LAIN [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 55; figures 1-5 * [A] 2; | [X]WO8806717 (RENISHAW PLC [GB]) [X] 1,7,8 * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4564909 (KRAMER MELVIN G [US]) [Y] 2-6 * column 3, line 62 - column 5, line 37; figures 1-5 *; | [X]JPS5744813 ; | [X]JPS60164212 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820629), vol. 006, no. 116, Database accession no. (P - 125), & JP57044813 A 19820313 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860111), vol. 010, no. 007, Database accession no. (P - 419), & JP60164212 A 19850827 (NIPPON VICTOR KK) [X] 1 * abstract * | Opposition | US4866269 |