EP0868885 - Articulated arm for surgeon's chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITAKA KOHKI CO., LTD. 1-4, Ohsawa 5-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states MITAKA KOHKI CO., LTD. 1-4, Ohsawa 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181 / JP | ||
Former [1998/41] | For all designated states MITAKA KOHKI CO., LTD. 1-4, Ohsawa 5-chome Mitaka-shi, Tokyo 181-0015 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Katsushige 653-1, Tate-machi Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0944 / JP | 02 /
Ota, Tomio 22-31, Tezuka-yama 1-chome, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-0037 / JP | [1998/41] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Skone James, Robert Edmund GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/41] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302318.5 | 26.03.1998 | [1998/41] | Priority number, date | JP19970080175 | 31.03.1997 Original published format: JP 8017597 | [1998/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0868885 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0868885 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, F16M11/14, F16C11/10, A47C1/03 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
F16M11/14 (EP,US);
A61B90/60 (EP,US);
F16C11/106 (EP,US);
F16M11/2078 (EP,US);
F16M2200/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/24] |
Former [1998/41] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gelenkarm für einen Arztstuhl | [1998/41] | English: | Articulated arm for surgeon's chair | [1998/41] | French: | Bras articulé pour chaises chirurgicales | [1998/41] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.10.2002 | IT | 30.10.2002 | SE | 30.01.2003 | GB | 26.03.2003 | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 30.10.2002 | |
SE | 30.01.2003 | ||
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | SE | 30.01.2003 | |
GB | 26.03.2003 | ||
Former [2003/27] | SE | 30.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3124328 (KORTSCH) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 23-27; figure - *; | [Y]US3278207 (BARISH EMIL Z, et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8503112 (WALLIS FREDERICK A) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE29511900U (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 13, line 9 - page 14, line 5; figure - *; | [A]EP0696442 (MITAKA KOKI KK [JP]) [A] 1* column 8, lines 14-56; figure - * |