EP0867488 - Ink jet print head containing a radiation curable resin layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lexmark International, Inc. 740 New Circle Road NW Lexington, Kentucky 40511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/23] | For all designated states LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL, INC. 740 New Circle Road NW Lexington, Kentucky 40511 / US | ||
Former [1998/40] | For all designated states LEXMARK INTERNATIONAL, INC. 740 New Circle Road Lexington, Kentucky 40511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patil, Girish P. 2345 Golden Oak Drive Lexington, Kentucky 40515 / US | 02 /
Williams, Gary R. 3218 Pimlico Parkway Lexington, Kentucky 40517 / US | 03 /
Spivey, Paul T. 3351 Cove Lake Drive, Apartment 174 Lexington, Kentucky 40515 / US | [1998/40] | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1998/40] | Skailes, Humphrey John Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302358.1 | 27.03.1998 | [1998/40] | Priority number, date | US19970827564 | 28.03.1997 Original published format: US 827564 | [1998/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0867488 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0867488 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D163/00, C08G59/68 | [1998/40] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
B41J2/1603 (EP,US);
B41J2/1607 (EP,US);
B41J2/1623 (EP,US);
B41J2/1631 (EP,US);
B41J2/1645 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L63/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/40] | Extension states | AL | 30.03.1999 | LT | 30.03.1999 | LV | 30.03.1999 | MK | 30.03.1999 | RO | 30.03.1999 | SI | 30.03.1999 | Title | German: | Strahlungshärtbare Harzschicht enthaltender Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [1998/40] | English: | Ink jet print head containing a radiation curable resin layer | [1998/40] | French: | Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre contenant une couche de résine durcissable par rayonnement | [1998/40] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/20] | 31.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.2003 | BE | 04.06.2003 | CH | 04.06.2003 | FI | 04.06.2003 | IT | 04.06.2003 | LI | 04.06.2003 | NL | 04.06.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | [2008/14] |
Former [2004/29] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
BE | 04.06.2003 | ||
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
DE | 05.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 04.06.2003 | |
CH | 04.06.2003 | ||
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | ||
NL | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 04.06.2003 | |
LI | 04.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4401537 (CHERN MAO-JIN [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - column 10, line 17; claims 1-7 *; | [DA]US4688053 (NOGUCHI HIROMICHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1* column 2, line 52 - column 18, line 17 *; | JPH0384026 [ ] (TOYO BOSEKI); | [A]EP0432795 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,9 * page 2, line 45 - page 8, line 31; claims 1-9 *; | JPH091804 [ ] (CANON KK); | JPH0924614 [ ] (CANON KK); | [A] - "protect cot material bubble jet record head wire", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 14, Database accession no. 149240, XP002069479 [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * | [A] - "photo thermal cure resin composition seal electronic part", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 91, no. 20, Database accession no. 146197, XP002069480 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - "ink jet record lead manufacture method ink jet print process flow path material", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 11, Database accession no. 114200, XP002069481 [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * | by applicant | US4090936 | US4623676 | US4688053 |