EP0876006 - Multi-hop telecommunications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1998/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Javitt, Joel I. 194 Wilder Street Hillside, New Jersey 07205 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Asquith, Julian Peter, et al Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302379.7 | 27.03.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19970847196 | 01.05.1997 Original published format: US 847196 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0876006 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0876006 | Date: | 26.01.2000 | [2000/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04Q7/20 | [2000/03] | CPC: |
H04B7/155 (EP,US);
H04M1/725 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04W84/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/45] | H04B7/155 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/40] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrsprung Telekommunikationsanordnung | [1998/45] | English: | Multi-hop telecommunications system | [1998/45] | French: | Système de télécommunication à sauts multiples | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 01.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/15] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4578815 (PERSINOTTI GARY W [US]) [X] 1,3-6,9,10,15,18 * column 3, line 25 - column 4, line 10 * * column 4, line 55 - column 9, line 63 * * figure 3 *; | [A] - LIGOTKY H K, "RURTEL: A MICROWAVE SYSTEM FOR RURAL TELECOMMUNICATION", ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION,BE,ALCATEL. BRUSSELS, vol. 63, no. 3, ISSN 0013-4252, page 200-210, XP000085092 [A] 8,23 * page 203, column R, line 6 - line 27 * |