Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0869178
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.12.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] |
15.08.2003 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.02.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
04.02.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
27.11.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
12.04.2002 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.07.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
11.06.1999 |
Change - priority |
published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] |
30.04.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.06.1999 [1999/24] |
16.04.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |
21.08.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.10.1998 [1998/41] |