EP0875501 - Alkylenediamine derivative, anti-ulcer drug, and antibacterial drug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states SHISEIDO COMPANY LIMITED 5-5 Ginza 7-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishino, Chikao Shiseido Res. Ctr. (2), 2-12-1 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
Uetake, Tomohiro 10-2, Sotokanda 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0021 / JP | 03 /
Kojima, Nao c/o Shiseido Co., Ltd, 5-5, Ginza 7-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8010 / JP | 04 /
Fukunishi, Hirotada Shiseido Res. Ctr. (1), 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP | 05 /
Sato, Fumitaka Shiseido Res. Ctr. (1), 1050, Nippa-cho, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 223-8553 / JP | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Jones, Helen M.M., et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Jones, Helen Marjorie Meredith, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/45] | Perry, Robert Edward GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302659.2 | 06.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | JP19970102631 | 04.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10263197 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875501 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875501 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0875501 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C235/50, C07C235/60, C07C237/34, C07D213/82, C07D213/81, A61K31/165, A61K31/44 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07D213/81 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C233/78 (EP,US);
C07C235/50 (EP,US);
C07C235/60 (EP,US);
C07C235/84 (EP,US);
C07C237/34 (EP,US);
C07C237/42 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/45] | Title | German: | Alkylene-Derivat, Anti-ulcus und antibakterielle Arzneimittel | [1998/45] | English: | Alkylenediamine derivative, anti-ulcer drug, and antibacterial drug | [1998/45] | French: | Dérivé d'alkylène-diamines, médicament antiulcéreux et antibactérien | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 05.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/35] | 07.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2004 | BE | 16.06.2004 | CH | 16.06.2004 | FI | 16.06.2004 | IT | 16.06.2004 | LI | 16.06.2004 | NL | 16.06.2004 | DK | 16.09.2004 | GR | 16.09.2004 | SE | 16.09.2004 | ES | 27.09.2004 | PT | 16.11.2004 | [2008/14] |
Former [2006/13] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
NL | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
ES | 27.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
DK | 16.09.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
BE | 16.06.2004 | ||
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 16.06.2004 | |
CH | 16.06.2004 | ||
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
GR | 16.09.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
FI | 16.06.2004 | ||
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | ||
SE | 16.09.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 16.06.2004 | |
LI | 16.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1458953 (ACRAF) [Y] 1-19 * page 2; claims 3,6 *; | [X]FR1542708 (ILE DE FRANCE) [X] 1,17 * examples 1-3 *; | [Y]FR2245619 (ILE DE FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-19 * page 2, line 3 - line 4; claim - *; | [Y]FR2352791 (MERCKLE KG CHEM PHARM L [DE]) [Y] 1-19 * page 6, line 13 - line 14; claim - *; | [A]FR2452478 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1-19 * claim - *; | [A]GB2160871 (BRISTOL MYERS CO) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0183190 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]EP0735031 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-19* abstract *; | [X] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002071567 [X] 1 * Registry (compound) numbers: 6802-82-0; 6802-83-1; 47210-63-9; 53408-50-7 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19891218), vol. 111, no. 25, Database accession no. 224842, XP002071560 [X] 1,17 * abstract * | [ ] - H. YOSHIDA ET AL., PHARM. RES., (1989), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 877 - 882 | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002071568 [ ] * registry number: 5486-77-1 * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19700622), vol. 72, no. 25, Database accession no. 130877, XP002071561 [X] 1,17 * abstract * | [ ] - Y. KASE ET AL., JAP. J. PHARMACOL., (1970), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 1 - 9 | [ ] - REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002071569 [ ] * registry number : 10330-67-3 * | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19890424), vol. 110, no. 17, Database accession no. 147598, XP002071562 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [ ] - R.K. GUPTA ET AL., ARCH. INT. PHARMACODYN. THER., (1989), vol. 297, pages 158 - 165 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880912), vol. 109, no. 11, Database accession no. 86083, XP002071563 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [ ] - T.G. KAREVINA ET AL., FARMAKOL. TOKSIKOL., (1988), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 56 - 60 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871109), vol. 107, no. 19, Database accession no. 168563, XP002071564 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [ ] - G.B. GLAVIN ET AL., LIFE SCI., (1987), vol. 41, no. 11, pages 1397 - 1408 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19841022), vol. 101, no. 17, Database accession no. 143911, XP002071565 [Y] 1-19 * abstract * | [ ] - M.S. MANEKAR ET AL., INDIAN J. PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL., (1984), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 67 - 70 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880815), vol. 109, no. 7, Database accession no. 54441, XP002071566 [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [ ] - I. MONKOVIC ET AL., JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON US, (1988), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 1548 - 1558 |