EP0874261 - High density riser and plenum breakout cables for indoor and outdoor cable applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.01.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Travieso, Ruben 10615 Victory Gate Dr. Alpharetta, Georgia, 30202 / US | 02 /
Viriyayuthakorn, Montri 1102 Hampton Crossing Norcross, Georgia, 30093 / US | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/44] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98302867.1 | 14.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | US19970844745 | 21.04.1997 Original published format: US 844745 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874261 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0874261 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/4411 (EP,US);
G02B6/443 (EP,US);
G02B6/4403 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/10] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kabel hoher Dichte für Steigleitung und Deckenzwischenraum und für den Innen- und Aussengebrauch | [1998/44] | English: | High density riser and plenum breakout cables for indoor and outdoor cable applications | [1998/44] | French: | Câble d'installation de haute densité pour l'utilisation à l'intérieur et à l'extérieur | [1998/44] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/06] | 21.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2004/08] | 21.09.2003 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2004/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58150906 ; | [XY]US4715677 (SAITO YASUNORI [US], et al); | [Y]GB2215081 (STC PLC [GB]); | [A]US5253318 (SAYEGH EMILE G [US], et al); | [Y]US5621841 (FIELD LARRY W [US]) |