EP0874027 - Electron beam curable resin composition and composite sheet material produced therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2001 [2001/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oji Paper Company Limited 7-5 Ginza 4-Chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | For all designated states Oji Paper Company Limited 7-5 Ginza 4-Chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Hirotake, c/o Oji Paper Co., Ltd. Shinonome Res. Lab., 1-10-6, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Shirai, Kazuhiko, c/o Oji Paper Co., Ltd. Shinonome Res. Lab., 1-10-6, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Miyata, Tadakazu, c/o Oji Paper Co., Ltd. Shinonome Res. Lab., 1-10-6, Shinonome Koto-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/44] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/44] | Harrison, Ivor Stanley, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303156.8 | 23.04.1998 | [1998/44] | Priority number, date | JP19970109239 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10923997 | JP19970109336 | 25.04.1997 Original published format: JP 10933697 | [1998/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0874027 | Date: | 28.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0874027 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C08F222/10, C08F220/36, C09D4/06, C08F290/06, D21H19/58, G03C1/79, B32B27/10 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
G03C1/79 (EP);
C08F290/061 (EP);
C08F290/062 (EP);
C08F290/067 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09D4/06 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/36 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/1065 (EP);
C09D4/06, C08F290/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/31] |
Former [1998/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durch Elektronenstrahl härtbare Harzzusammensetzung und daraus gefertigtes Schichtverbundmaterial | [1999/47] | English: | Electron beam curable resin composition and composite sheet material produced therefrom | [1998/44] | French: | Composition de résine durcissable aux rayons d'électrones et matériau composite en feuille | [1998/44] |
Former [1998/44] | Durch Elektronenstahl härtbare Harzzusammensetzung und daraus gefertigtes Schichtverbundmaterial | Examination procedure | 25.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/10] | 03.10.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2001/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.07.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2000 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JPH09250097 ; | [X]JPH06175276 ; | [X]JPH06171051 ; | [XD]JPS63130608 ; | [X]EP0234430 (KOHJIN CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * page 1, line 7 - line 12 * * page 3, line 18 - line 33 * * page 4, line 29 - line 43 * * page 5, line 9 - line 13 * * examples 1-3 * * claims 1,2,5,8 *; | [X]JPH08183824 ; | [A]JPH06198829 ; | [XP]WO9719898 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [XP] 1-6,8,10,13,15 * page 7, line 20 - line 35 * * page 16, line 10 - page 18, line 7 * * synthetic examples * * claims 1-6 *; | [X]GB2195643 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,11,13,15,17 * page 2, line 40 - page 3, line 10 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 2 * * page 10, line 27 - page 11, line 34 * * examples 22,33 * * comparative example 15 * * claim 1 *; | [X]JPH0748422 ; | [X]JPH0817256 ; | [X]EP0457499 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,11,13,15,17 * page 2, line 20 - line 37 * * page 3, line 37 - page 4, line 5 * * example 2 * * claims 1-8 *; | [X]EP0368659 (HITACHI MAXELL [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6,13,15 * page 21, line 44 - page 22, line 51 * * (compounds 2,3 on page 22) * * page 26, compounds 10, 11 * * claims 6,7,12,13,28,29 *; | [XP]JPH1036462 ; | [XY]WO9714737 (DSM NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,13,15 * page 10, line 27 - page 13, line 25 * * example - * * claims 1-10 * * idem. * [Y] 1-11,13,15-18; | [XY]WO9502003 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10,13,15 * page 8, line 30 - line 34 * * claims 1,5,25 * * idem. * [Y] 1-11,13,15-18; | [X]JPS63312309 | [XP] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 97-522239, XP002070744 & JPH09250097 A 19970922 (OJI PAPER CO.) [XP] 1-3,11-13,15,17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 94-243310, XP002070745 & JPH06175276 A 19940624 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1-3,11-13,15,17 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 94-238250, XP002070746 & JPH06171051 A 19940621 (OJI PAPER CO) [X] 1-3,11-13,15,17 * abstract * | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 88-193680, XP002070607 & JPS63130608 A 19880602 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO. LTD.; YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO. LTD.) [XD] 1-3,11-13 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 96-379316, XP002070747 & JPH08183824 A 19960716 (TAKEMOTO OIL & FAT CO. LTD.) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 94-269145, XP002070748 & JPH06198829 A 19940719 (OJI PAPER CO. LTD.) [A] 1-3 * abstract * | [T] - AZAM ALI M ET AL, "STUDY OF RADIATION-CURED THIN FILMS OF ALIPHATIC AND AROMATIC URETHANE ACRYLATE PREPOLYMERS", ADVANCES IN POLYMER TECHNOLOGY, (19980921), vol. 17, no. 3, ISSN 0730-6679, pages 259 - 267, XP000790461 [T] 1-15 * whole paper and references therein * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1098-2329(199823)17:3<259::AID-ADV6>3.0.CO;2-R | [X] - M.A. ALI, M.A. KHAN, K.M. IDRISS ALI, "Comparative Study of Electron Beam and Ultraviolet-Cured Films of Urethane Acrylate", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 60, no. 6, ISSN 0969-806X, pages 879 - 885, XP002115806 [X] 1-6,10,13,15 * whole paper, in particular the compounds of table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-4628(19960509)60:6<879::AID-APP11>3.0.CO;2-S | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 095, no. 005, & JP07048422 A 19950221 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [X] 2,4,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08017256 A 19960119 (HITACHI CABLE LTD.) [X] 2 * see also WPI 96-121249 and CAPLUS 1996:184153 * | [X] - KRONGAUZ V V ET AL, "REACTIVE DILUENTS AND PROPERTIES OF ULTRAVIOLET-CURED POLYCARBONATEURETHANE ACRYLATES", JOURNAL OF APPLIED POLYMER SCIENCE, (19950926), vol. 57, no. 13, ISSN 0021-8995, pages 1627 - 1636, XP000542988 [X] 1,2,5 * whole paper, in particular under "formulations" (CHA) and table II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/app.1995.070571309 | [X] - K. ZAMAN AND T. SASAKI, Effects of Diluents and Irradiation Conditions on EB Curing of Urethane Acrylates, NORTHBROOK, ILL. (US), RAD. TECH. INT. NORTH AMERICA, RADTECH ASIA'91 CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (19910418), XP002116135 [X] 1,2,5,13,15 * whole paper, in particular formulations (table 2) * | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980430), vol. 098, no. 006, & JP10036462 A 19980210 (TOAGOSEI CO. LTD.) [XP] 1,2,7,11,13,15 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 89-037242, XP002116136 & JPS63312309 A 19881220 (DESOTO INC; JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO. LTD.) [X] 1-3,10 * abstract * |