EP0881721 - Electrical connector and assembly jig combination and method of attaching a wire to the connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/49] | Connector and method of attaching a wire thereto | ||
[2001/32] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Masahiko, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 02 /
Furutani, Mitsugu, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 03 /
Okumura, Hitoshi, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | 04 /
Atsumi, Keigo, c/o Sumitomo Wiring Systems Ltd 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie 510 / JP | [1998/49] | Representative(s) | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | Chettle, Adrian John, et al Withers & Rogers, 4, Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2QP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303157.6 | 23.04.1998 | [1998/49] | Priority number, date | JP19970137206 | 27.05.1997 Original published format: JP 13720697 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0881721 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0881721 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/01 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
H01R43/01 (EP,US);
H01R4/2466 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4919 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/49] |
Former [1998/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder und Montageeinheit Kombination sowie Verfahren zum Anschliessen eines Drahtes an den Verbinder | [2001/32] | English: | Electrical connector and assembly jig combination and method of attaching a wire to the connector | [2001/32] | French: | Combinaison de connecteur électrique et de bâti d'assemblage ainsi que procédé pour attacher un fil au connecteur | [2001/32] |
Former [1998/49] | Verbinder und Verfahren zum Anschliesen eines Drahtes an denselben | ||
Former [1998/49] | Connector and method of attaching a wire thereto | ||
Former [1998/49] | Connecteur et procédé pour attacher un fil à celui-ci | Examination procedure | 04.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/49] | 26.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/25] | 13.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3959868 (MATHE ISTVAN) [A] 1,8* figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5018269 (ISHIDA MASAHIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,8 * figures 3-5 *; | [X]FR2656469 (FRANCELCO SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * page 7, line 6 - line 19 * * page 8, line 26 - line 29; figures 4,5,7; claim 8 *; | [X]FR2703520 (FRANCELCO SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10 * page 5, line 17 - line 34; figures 3,4; claim 4 *; | [XA]US5575061 (TSUJI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * column 9, line 35 - column 11, line 64; figures 5-10 * [A] 3; | [X]US5581879 (TSUJI MASANORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-10 * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 39; figures 5-8 * |