blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0874319

EP0874319 - Method and apparatus for locating nodes in a carded heap [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.
2550 Garcia Avenue
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[1998/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Wolczko, Mario I.
580 Arastradero Road, No. 503
Palo Alto, California 94306 / US
02 / Ungar, David M.
844 Driftwood Drive
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
[1998/44]
Representative(s)Foster, Mark Charles
Edward Evans Barker
Clifford's Inn
Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/44]Foster, Mark Charles
Edward Evans & Co., Chancery House, 53-64 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1SD / GB
Application number, filing date98303165.923.04.1998
[1998/44]
Priority number, dateUS1997084213623.04.1997         Original published format: US 842136
[1998/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0874319
Date:28.10.1998
Language:EN
[1998/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0874319
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06F12/02
[1998/44]
CPC:
G06F12/0276 (EP,US); Y10S707/99944 (US); Y10S707/99953 (US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1998/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lokalisierung von Knoten in einem in Karten geteilten Haufen[1998/44]
English:Method and apparatus for locating nodes in a carded heap[1998/44]
French:Procédé et dispositif de localisation de noeuds dans un tas partagé en cartes[1998/44]
Examination procedure19.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/33]
01.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/20]
11.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.200104   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2001
30.04.200306   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]  - HOSKING A L ET AL, "A COMPARATIVE PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF WRITE BARRIER IMPLEMENTATIONS", ACM SIGPLAN NOTICES,US,ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, NEW YORK, (199210), vol. 27, no. 10, ISSN 0362-1340, page 92-109, XP000327291 [X] 1-12 * page 97, column L, line 31 - page 98, column L, line 10 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/141937.141946
 [A]  - WILSON P R ET AL, "DESIGN OF THE OPPORTUNISTIC GARBAGE COLLECTOR", PROCEEDINGS OF THE OBJECT ORIENTED PROGRAMMING SYSTEMS LANGUAGES AND APPLICATIONS CONFERENCE. (OOPSLA),US,READING, ACM, (19891001), vol. CONF. 4, page 23-35, XP000299228 [A] 1-12 * page 33, column R, line 20 - page 34, column L, line 7 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.