EP0875571 - CRFG-1, target and marker for chronic renal failure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laping, Nicholas, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 02 /
Olson, Barbara, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | 03 /
Zhu, Yuan, SmithKline Beecham Pharm. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [1998/45] | Representative(s) | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/45] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303237.6 | 27.04.1998 | [1998/45] | Priority number, date | US19970045203P | 30.04.1997 Original published format: US 45203 P | US19970988028 | 10.12.1997 Original published format: US 988028 | [1998/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0875571 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0875571 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | [2000/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/566 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/19] |
Former [1998/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | CRFG-1, Ziel und Marker für chronisches Nierenversagen | [1998/45] | English: | CRFG-1, target and marker for chronic renal failure | [1998/45] | French: | CRFG-1, cible et marqueur pour l'insufficience rénale chronique | [1998/45] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 23.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9518225 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al) |