EP0878344 - Seat sliding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states FUJIKIKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-13 Nihonbashihoncho 3-chome, Chuou-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanda, Yoshihiro c/o Fujikiko K.K., Washizu-Kojyo, 2028, Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Matsuura, Hiroshi c/o Fujikiko K.K., Washizu-Kojyo, 2028, Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/47] | Abbie, Andrew Kenneth, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303361.4 | 29.04.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | JP19970122497 | 13.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12249797 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878344 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878344 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/12 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B60N2/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2001/20] |
Former [1998/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sitzgleitvorrichtung | [1998/47] | English: | Seat sliding apparatus | [1998/47] | French: | Dispositif de glissière d'un siège | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2000 | Examination requested [2000/52] | 01.03.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, ES, IT | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5100092 (SOVIS DAVID M [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 31; figure 2 * [A] 2,5; | [XA]EP0644080 (CESA [FR]) [X] 1,8 * column 2, line 30 - line 57; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,5; | [XA]GB2255903 (OHI SEISAKUSHO CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 20; figure 1 * [A] 2,5; | [XA]US5052751 (HAYAKAWA HATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 15; figure 4 * [A] 2,5; | [E]JPH11301319 ; | [E]JPH11301318 (FUJI KIKO KK) [E] 1,2,8 * figure 10 * | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 02, & JP11301319 A 19991102 (FUJI KIKO CO LTD) [E] 1,2,8 * abstract * |