EP0877444 - Downlink beam forming architecture for heavily overlapped beam configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1998/46] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeffries, Andrew William Finches, Wood End Widdington, Saffron Walden CB11 3SN / GB | 02 /
Ward, Christopher Robert 14 Princes Gate, Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire CM23 4DF / GB | 03 /
Smith, Martin Stevens 8 Chuzzlewit Drive Chelmsford, Essex CM1 4XQ / GB | [1998/46] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road, Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | Anderson, Angela, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group, Harlow Laboratories, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2000/37] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [1999/45] | Williamson, Brian, et al Nortel Networks, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [1998/46] | Franks, Robert Benjamin 352 Omega Court, Cemetery Road Sheffield S11 8FT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303391.1 | 30.04.1998 | [1998/46] | Priority number, date | US19970851164 | 05.05.1997 Original published format: US 851164 | [1998/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0877444 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0877444 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q25/00, H01Q3/40, H04Q7/36 | [1998/46] | CPC: |
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/267 (EP,US);
H01Q3/40 (EP,US);
H04W16/24 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [1999/29] |
Former [1998/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Strahlformungsarchitektur für die Abwärtsstrecke bei einer Anordnung mit stark überlappenden Keulen | [1998/46] | English: | Downlink beam forming architecture for heavily overlapped beam configuration | [1998/46] | French: | Architecture pour la formation de faisceaux dans la liaison descendante pour une configuration avec faisceaux en chevauchement | [1998/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/46] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 29.09.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | [2005/11] |
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9534103 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-8,11-14,16-21 * page 3, line 12 - page 4, line 10 * * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 2; figures 2-4 *; | [X]WO9534102 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,11-14,18-21 * page 5, line 4 - page 7, line 30; figures 3,4 *; | [X]WO9700543 (WATKINS JOHNSON CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,13 * page 8, line 6 - page 11, line 2 * * page 34, line 8 - page 37, line 11 *; | [X]US4907004 (ZACHARATOS JOHN [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,9-15,18-21 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 31 * * column 5, line 34 - column 6, line 30; figures 1,3; claims 1-10 *; | [X]EP0639035 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [X] 22-27 * column 14, lines 13-53; figures 13,14 *; | [PX]EP0786826 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [PX] 1-5,7,9-21 * column 3, line 35 - column 6, line 34; figure 6 *; | [PX]WO9723017 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [PX] 22-27 * page 16, line 17 - page 17, line 8 * * page 19, line 22 - page 20, line 27 *; | [A] - YESIN S V, "THE DESIGN OF AN AUTOMATIC PHASING SYSTEM FOR A MULTICHANNEL MICROWAVE SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION SYSTEM*", TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RADIO ENGINEERING, (19870701), vol. 41 / 42, no. 7, pages 67 - 70, XP000210327 |