blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0878933

EP0878933 - Receiving apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  26.04.2002
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.06.2002  [2002/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okada, Takahiro, c/o Sony Corporation
Intel. Prop. Dept., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
02 / Ito, Osamu, c/o Sony Corporation
Intel. Prop. Dept., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
03 / Ikeda, Tamotsu, c/o Sony Corporation
Intel. Prop. Dept., 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP
[1998/47]
Representative(s)Cotter, Ivan John, et al
D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/47]Cotter, Ivan John, et al
D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98303463.801.05.1998
[1998/47]
Priority number, dateJP1997011471402.05.1997         Original published format: JP 11471497
[1998/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0878933
Date:18.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.10.1998
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/06, H04J11/00, H04J1/00
[1998/47]
CPC:
H04L25/06 (EP,US); H04L1/08 (EP,US); H04L27/2647 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1999/30]
Former [1998/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Empfangseinrichtungen und Empfangsverfahren[1998/47]
English:Receiving apparatus and methods[1998/47]
French:Dispositif et procédés de réception[1998/47]
Examination procedure27.04.1999Examination requested  [1999/25]
16.04.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9205646  (NAT TRANSCOMMUNICATIONS LTD [GB]) [A] 1,6;
 [A]WO9210043  (THOMSON CSF [FR])[A] 1,6;
 [A]EP0653858  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,6;
 [A]WO9520848  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,6;
 [A]US5471464  (IKEDA YASUNARI [JP]) [A] 1,6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.