EP0962542 - Stable heat treatable nickel superalloy single crystal articles and compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2002 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/49] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duhl, David N. 31 Beacon Street Newington, Connecticut 06111 / US | 02 /
Cetel, Alan D. 90 Fuller Drive West Hartford, Connecticut 06117 / US | [1999/49] | Representative(s) | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Hall, Matthew Benjamin, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/49] | Leckey, David Herbert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303479.4 | 01.05.1998 | [1999/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0962542 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C30B29/52, C22F1/10 | [1999/49] | CPC: |
C22C19/057 (EP);
C22C19/056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/33] |
Former [1999/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wärmebehandlungsfähige, stabile und einkristalline Superlegierung auf Nickelbasis und Artikel | [1999/49] | English: | Stable heat treatable nickel superalloy single crystal articles and compositions | [1999/49] | French: | Superalliage monocrystaline à base de nickel de traitement thermique et l'article | [1999/49] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 09.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/43] | 21.05.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/43] | Request for further processing for: | 06.06.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.06.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4402772 (DUHL DAVID N ET AL) [X] 1-14 * column 4, lines 4-7; table 1 *; | [X]EP0052911 (CANNON MUSKEGON CORP) [X] 1-14 * pages 7-8 *; | [X]EP0240451 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) [X] 1-14 *alloy B*; | [A]US4492672 (DUHL DAVID N ET AL) [A] 1-14; | [A]US4371404 (DUHL DAVID N ET AL) [A] 1-14; | [A]US4878965 (GOSTIC WILLIAM J ET AL) [A] 1-14 |