15.01.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
08.10.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
13.07.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.04.2014 |
Change - representative |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
26.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2010 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] |
13.04.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.11.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.07.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.05.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.05.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.01.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.09.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.05.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.01.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.12.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
06.09.2002 |
First examination report |
|
30.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
16.08.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] |
13.07.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.08.2002 [2002/35] |
28.05.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.11.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
30.11.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
30.11.2001 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
22.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.05.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.10.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.11.1998 [1998/48] |