EP0880139 - Signal recording and/or reproducing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Takao, c/o Sony Corporation Intel. Prop. Dept., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Ohta, Masashi, c/o Sony Corporation Intel. Prop. Dept., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Akiba, Toshiya, c/o Sony Corporation Intel. Prop. Dept., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Tomita, Masami, c/o Sony Corporation Intel. Prop. Dept., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | 05 /
Suito, Taro, c/o Sony Corporation Intel. Prop. Dept., 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/21] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Königstrasse 5 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Turner, James Arthur, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [1998/48] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303746.6 | 13.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | JP19970128233 | 19.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12823397 | JP19970250542 | 16.09.1997 Original published format: JP 25054297 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880139 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880139 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | [2002/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/036, G11B20/10, H04N5/76 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
H04N9/8045 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/032 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/036 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/11 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10592 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2020/10916 (EP,KR,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2525 (EP,US);
G11B2220/65 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1998/48] | G11B27/02, G11B27/036, G11B20/10, H04N5/76 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/40] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signalaufzeichnung und/oder -wiedergabe | [1998/48] | English: | Signal recording and/or reproducing | [1998/48] | French: | Enregistrement et/ou reproduction de signal | [1998/48] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 04.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | EP10178958.4 / EP2267718 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0745047 ; | [X]EP0286412 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 62 - page 4, line 18; figure 2 *; | [X]EP0543446 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,4,7 * column 5, line 30 - column 12, line 14 *; | [A]EP0615244 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7* column 14, line 19 - column 16, line 37 *; | [A]EP0684570 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 5, line 25 - column 8, line 55 *; | [PX]EP0778572 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-7 * column 20, line 51 - column 25, line 46 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950630), vol. 1995, no. 05, & JP07045047 A 19950214 (SHARP CORP) [X] 1,4,7 * abstract * |