EP0878772 - Printing system and method of printing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [1998/47] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-Chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Masahiko c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [1998/47] | Representative(s) | Tothill, John Paul, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Tothill, John Paul, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1998/47] | Price, Anthony Stuart Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98303770.6 | 13.05.1998 | [1998/47] | Priority number, date | JP19970124577 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: JP 12457797 | JP19980114202 | 08.04.1998 Original published format: JP 11420298 | [1998/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0878772 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0878772 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0878772 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/10 | [1998/47] | CPC: |
B41J2/5056 (EP,US);
G06K15/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/47] | Title | German: | Drucksystem und -verfahren | [1998/47] | English: | Printing system and method of printing | [1998/47] | French: | Système et méthode d'impression | [1998/47] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 16.08.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15] | Request for further processing for: | 14.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.03.2007 | Decision despatched | 22.12.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2006 | Decision despatched | 15.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2007 | BE | 02.05.2007 | CH | 02.05.2007 | CY | 02.05.2007 | DK | 02.05.2007 | FI | 02.05.2007 | IT | 02.05.2007 | LI | 02.05.2007 | NL | 02.05.2007 | LU | 13.05.2007 | IE | 14.05.2007 | MC | 31.05.2007 | SE | 02.08.2007 | GR | 03.08.2007 | ES | 13.08.2007 | PT | 02.10.2007 | [2010/05] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
IT | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
IE | 14.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
GR | 03.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/15] | AT | 02.05.2007 | |
BE | 02.05.2007 | ||
CH | 02.05.2007 | ||
DK | 02.05.2007 | ||
FI | 02.05.2007 | ||
LI | 02.05.2007 | ||
NL | 02.05.2007 | ||
MC | 31.05.2007 | ||
SE | 02.08.2007 | ||
ES | 13.08.2007 | ||
PT | 02.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4069486 (FOX SIDNEY JARED) [X] 1-5,9 * column 4, line 54 - column 6, line 48; figures 2,4 * [Y] 6-8; | [XY]EP0600707 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,3 * page 5, lines 33-56; figures 1,2 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]EP0800923 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 14, lines 23-34; claim 5 ** column 18, line 24 - column 20, line 15 * |