blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0884489

EP0884489 - Ball joint [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.06.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.07.2001 [2001/30]
Applicant(s)For:GB 
Ford Motor Company Limited
Eagle Way Brentwood
Essex CM13 3BW / GB
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S.A.
B.P. 307
92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse
50735 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]For:GB 
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED
Eagle Way
Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB
For:FR 
FORD FRANCE S. A.
B.P. 307
92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR
For:DE 
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werk Köln-Niehl, Henry Ford Strasse
50735 Köln / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Free, Bernard John
85, Eastwoodbury Lane
Southend on Sea, Essex, SS2 6UY / GB
[1998/51]
Representative(s)Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
Harrison IP Limited
3 Ebor House
London Ebor Business Park
Millfield Lane
Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1998/51]Messulam, Alec Moses, et al
A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway
Leigh-on-Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB
Application number, filing date98303793.814.05.1998
[1998/51]
Priority number, dateGB1997001233714.06.1997         Original published format: GB 9712337
[1998/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0884489
Date:16.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0884489
Date:19.01.2000
[2000/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.12.1999
ClassificationIPC:F16C11/06
[1998/51]
CPC:
F16C11/0604 (EP,US); B60G7/005 (EP,US); F16C11/0628 (EP,US);
B60G2204/148 (EP,US); B60G2204/416 (EP,US); F16C2326/05 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32565 (EP,US); Y10T403/32631 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
Former [1998/51]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Kugelgelenk[1998/51]
English:Ball joint[1998/51]
French:Articulation à rotule[1998/51]
Examination procedure27.11.1998Examination requested  [1999/04]
12.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.01.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/30]
15.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB623506  (JERMYN AND POINTER LTD, et al);
 [X]GB698473  (THORLEIF STOKKE, et al);
 [A]US4749299  (SWANSON CARL H [US]);
 [A]WO9533139  (ITT AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRICAL SYST [US])
ExaminationUS4679957
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.