EP0893137 - Assembly for an indwelling catheter and method of making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo Kabushiki Kaisha 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | For all designated states TERUMO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 44-1, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Tsuneo 1297-9 Iinoshinden Shirane-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Masahiko 106-4 Miyazawa Kosai-cho Nakakoma-gun Yamanashi / JP | [1999/04] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/04] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304054.4 | 21.05.1998 | [1999/04] | Priority number, date | JP19970211346 | 22.07.1997 Original published format: JP 21134697 | [1999/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0893137 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0893137 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0893137 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/06, A61M5/32 | [1999/04] | CPC: |
A61M25/0014 (EP,US);
A61M25/0017 (EP,US);
A61M25/0693 (EP,US);
A61M25/0009 (EP,US);
A61M25/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1999/04] | Title | German: | Verweilkathetersatz und Herstellungsmetode | [1999/04] | English: | Assembly for an indwelling catheter and method of making it | [1999/04] | French: | Assemblage de cathéter à demeure et méthode pour sa fabrication | [1999/04] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/31] | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | CY | 31.03.2004 | FI | 31.03.2004 | IT | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | NL | 31.03.2004 | IE | 21.05.2004 | LU | 21.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | DK | 30.06.2004 | GR | 30.06.2004 | SE | 30.06.2004 | ES | 12.07.2004 | PT | 31.08.2004 | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
CY | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 21.05.2004 | ||
LU | 21.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
NL | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 21.05.2004 | ||
LU | 21.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
IE | 21.05.2004 | ||
LU | 21.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LU | 21.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
DK | 30.06.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
ES | 12.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 31.03.2004 | |
FI | 31.03.2004 | ||
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
GR | 30.06.2004 | ||
SE | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 31.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4377165 (LUTHER RONALD B [US], et al); | [Y]WO9313821 (SUEDDEUTSCHE FEINMECHANIK [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * column A * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 24; figures 2,5,6; claims 5,6,9 *; | [YD]US5279572 (HOKAMA YASUO [JP]) [YD] 1-10 * column A * * column 3, line 12 - line 20; figures 1,3,4; claim 1 * | by applicant | US5279572 | JPH0732803 |