EP0880052 - Liquid crystal device and method of production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, Harry Garth 45 Beauchamp Place, Beauchamp Lane Cowley, Oxford, OX4 3NE / GB | [1998/48] | Representative(s) | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [1998/48] | Robinson, John Stuart Marks & Clerk Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304069.2 | 21.05.1998 | [1998/48] | Priority number, date | GB19970010481 | 22.05.1997 Original published format: GB 9710481 | [1998/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0880052 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0880052 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337 | [1998/48] | CPC: |
G02F1/133753 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133723 (KR);
G02F1/133788 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/34] |
Former [1998/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallvorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/48] | English: | Liquid crystal device and method of production | [1998/48] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/39] |
Former [1998/48] | Dispositif d'affichage à cristal liquide et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 22.05.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/28] | 21.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH07253578 ; | [DX]EP0689084 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DX] 1,2,8,11-13 * page 4, line 20 - line 58; figures 4,5 * * examples 5,8 * * claim 17 *; | [A]EP0706074 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-24 * page 7, line 16 - line 26; figure 5; claims 9-13 *; | [DX]US5602661 (SCHADT MARTIN [CH], et al) [DX] 1,12 * column 7, line 54 - column 9, line 33; figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 18 - line 22 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 199, no. 602, & JP07253578 A 19951003 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,8,9,12,20,21 * abstract * |