EP0887670 - Method of fabricating an optical fibre having low loss at 1385 nm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chang, Kai Huei 170 Bayswater Drive Suwanee, Georgia 30174 / US | 02 /
Miller, Thomas John 3735 Banyon Lane Alpharetta, Georgia 30201 / US | 03 /
Kalish, David 732 Hemingway Lane Roswell, Georgia 30075 / US | 04 /
Pearsall, Michael L. 115 Morning Pine Court Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US | [1999/01] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2002/12] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1999/01] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304527.9 | 09.06.1998 | [1999/01] | Priority number, date | US19970879348 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: US 879348 | [1999/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0887670 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0887670 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | [1999/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0887670 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/16, C03B37/012, C03B37/014 | [1999/01] | CPC: |
C03B37/01211 (EP,US);
C03B37/01876 (KR);
C03B37/01228 (EP,US);
C03B37/01237 (EP,US);
C03B37/01248 (EP,US);
C03B37/01446 (EP,US);
C03B37/01861 (KR);
C03B37/07 (KR);
C03C25/106 (EP,US);
C03C25/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/04 (EP,US);
C03B2201/075 (EP,US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/31 (EP,US);
C03B2203/24 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1999/01] | G02B6/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/47] |
Former [1999/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellungsmethode einer optischen Faser mit geringen Verlusten bei 1385 nm | [1999/01] | English: | Method of fabricating an optical fibre having low loss at 1385 nm | [1999/01] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une fibre optique à faible perte à 1385 nm | [1999/01] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/53] | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1999 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00127534.6 / EP1104891 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4820322 (BAUMGART JERRY W [US], et al) [DY] 1,4-8 * column 4, line 3 - column 6, line 29; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]US4737179 (TANAKA GOTARO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4-8 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 26 *; | [A]US5397372 (PARTUS FRED P [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 8 *; | [DA]US5000771 (FLEMING JR JAMES W [US], et al) [DA] 2,3,8,9 * column 4, line 17 - column 9, line 32 *; | [DA]US4578101 (CLARK HAROLD R [US], et al) [DA] 4 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0249230 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column 8, line 5 - column 15, line 27 *; | [A]US4880452 (KANAMORI HIROO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [DYA] - MORIYAMA T ET AL, "Ultimately low OH content VAD optical fibres", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, 28 AUG. 1980, UK, ISSN 0013-5194, vol. 16, no. 18, pages 698 - 699, XP002081489 [DY] 4 * the whole document * [A] 1 |