EP0884792 - Lead-acid batteries and grids therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GNB Technologies, Inc. 1110 Centre Points Curve Mendota Heights Minnesota 55118 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | For all designated states GNB Technologies, Inc. 1110 Centre Points Curve Mendota Heights, Minnesota 55118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rao, Purushothama 2360 Harlston Drive Aurora, Illinois 60505 / US | 02 /
Uhlemann, Thomas F. 3504 West 55th Street Edina, Minnesota 55410 / US | [1998/51] | Representative(s) | Goodanew, Martin Eric, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/51] | Goodanew, Martin Eric, et al MATHISEN, MACARA & CO. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304532.9 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/51] | Priority number, date | US19970872811 | 11.06.1997 Original published format: US 872811 | [1998/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0884792 | Date: | 16.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/68, H01M4/74 | [1998/51] | CPC: |
H01M4/685 (EP,US);
C22C11/06 (EP,US);
H01M4/745 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/49] |
Former [1999/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, LI | ||
Former [1998/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Blei-Akkumulatoren und Gittern dafür | [1998/51] | English: | Lead-acid batteries and grids therefore | [1998/51] | French: | Accumulateurs au plomb et grilles pour leur mise en oeuvre | [1998/51] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 17.06.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 06.12.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE | 14.04.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.09.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2758940 (VARTA BATTERIE) [X] 5 * paragraph [0001]; claims 1-3,7 *; | [A]EP0655792 (GNB BATTERY TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-4,7,8 * page 7, line 44 - line 51; figure 5; example 1; claim 11 ** page 9, line 45 - line 46 *; | [PX]US5691087 (RAO PURUSHOTHAMA [US], et al) [PX] 1-8 * column 10, line 37 - line 47; figures 4,5; claim 1 * * column 8, line 15 - line 22 * |