EP0886350 - High speed non-biased semiconductor laser diode driver for high speed digital communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando Florida 32819-8698 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Agere Systems Optoelectronics Guardian Corporation 9333 South John Young Parkway Orlando, Florida 32819-8698 / US | ||
Former [1998/52] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Yusuke 215 Laurel Hill Road Mountain Lakes, New Jersey 07046 / US | [1998/52] | Representative(s) | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Perkins, Sarah, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | ||
Former [1998/52] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98304537.8 | 09.06.1998 | [1998/52] | Priority number, date | US19970877910 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: US 877910 | [1998/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0886350 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0886350 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/042, H03K17/041 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
H03K17/04106 (EP,US);
H01S5/042 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/52] | H01S3/096, H03K17/041 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/35] |
Former [1998/52] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hochgeschwindigkeitstreiber für nicht polarisierte Halbleiter-Diodenlaser bei Hochgeschwindigkeits-Digitalübertragung | [1998/52] | English: | High speed non-biased semiconductor laser diode driver for high speed digital communication | [1998/52] | French: | Circuit de pilotage de diode laser à semi-conducteur non polarisée à vitesse élevée pour la communication numérique à vitesse élevée | [1998/52] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1998 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/52] | 09.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.07.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3711051 (COPAL ELECTRONICS [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,7,15 * column 10, line 49 - column 11, line 58; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0312143 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 2,3* page 4, line 37 - page 5, line 2; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4924473 (BURGYAN LAJOS [US], et al) [Y] 10,11 * column 4, line 32 - column 6, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [XY] - WEDDING B, "REDUCTION OF BIT ERROR RATE IN HIGH SPEED OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEMS DUE TO OPTIMIZED ELECTRICAL DRIVE PULSE SHAPING", EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL COMMUNICATION, BRIGHTON, SEPT. 11 - 15, 1988, INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, (19880911), vol. PART 1, no. CONF. 14, pages 187 - 190, XP000145107 [X] 1,5,8,13 * page 187, line 5 - line 34; figure 1B * [Y] 10,11 | [A] - HIROYUKI UENOHARA ET AL, "LONG-WAVELENGTH MULTIPLE-QUANTUM-WELL VOLTAGE-CONTROLLED BISTABLE LASER DIODES", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (19951201), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 2142 - 2147, XP000541556 [A] 1,5,6,8,13 * page 2144, column L, line 2 - line 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/3.477739 | [A] - HOWARD L ET AL, "NANOSECOND-PULSE GENERATOR FOR LASER DIODES", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (19891001), vol. 60, no. 10, pages 3343 - 3345, XP000071733 [A] 1-3 * page 3344, column L, line 5 - page 3345, column L, line 2; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1140528 |