Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] |
11.11.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
09.09.1999 | Change - extension states | |
06.08.1999 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
06.08.1999 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
09.07.1999 | Definitive list of designations | published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
30.10.1998 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |